Gibson v. TT of Woodmen, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bradon Gibson
Defendant: TT of Woodmen, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Teller
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2012, taking under advisement 5 Defendant's Motion for a Stay and to Compel Arbitration. (FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501) (mehcd)
March 21, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming 2/29/12 11 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge; granting 5 Motion to Stay. Status Report due by 6/19/2012. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/21/2012. The Clerk of the Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2.(jjpsl, )
May 1, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Motion to Compel Specific Performance Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 70 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/1/13.(dkals, )
June 13, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming 22 Report and Recommendations: 18 Motion to Reopen Case and Amended Motion to Compel Specific Performance Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 70 is granted in part and denied in part by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/13/13.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gibson v. TT of Woodmen, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradon Gibson
Represented By: Richard B. Wynkoop
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT of Woodmen, Inc.
Represented By: Wyn Terrell Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]