Gordon v. Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Amanda M. Gordon
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A five-day Jury Trial is set for 8/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 7/27/2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/24/2012. (rbjsec. )
July 18, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 45 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The Court, having considered the Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice [Docket #45], hereby grants the Stipulation. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/18/12. (mnfsl, )
January 6, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after all responsive pleadings are filed. Please see the order for details, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/06/2012. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gordon v. Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda M. Gordon
Represented By: Adan Cerda
Represented By: Robert F. Pribila
Represented By: Rufino Jerome Aquino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sheryl K. Bridges
Represented By: Christopher Kenneth Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]