Lilak v. Astrazenca Pharmaceutical-US Inc., Corporation

Plaintiff: Safdar Lilak
Defendant: Astrazenca Pharmaceutical-US Inc., Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00031
Filed: January 5, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint 29 and corrected amended complaint 30 shall be stricken, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/12/2012.(mjwcd)
August 15, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 37 Motion Requesting Permission to File Amended and Supplemental Pleading. Plaintiff's tendered 35 Amended Complaint shall be stricken. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/15/12.(mnfsl, )
January 23, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Status Conference for Pro Se Plaintiff set for 3/6/2012 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/23/2012. (mjwcd)
August 21, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 40 After Scheduling Conference, of March 6th, 2012 & 07/23/12 Rule D.C.Colo.LCivR16.1/16.2 Flurry of Motions & Objections to MJW Recommendation Plaintiff Proposes Following. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/21/12.(mnfsl, )
September 26, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 33 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceutical, LP's 6 Motion to Dismiss is granted. This case is dismissed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/26/12.(mnfsl, )
September 28, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 43 Order. By Clerk on 9/28/12. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lilak v. Astrazenca Pharmaceutical-US Inc., Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safdar Lilak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazenca Pharmaceutical-US Inc., Corporation
Represented By: Dylan M. Carson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]