211 Eighth, LLC et al v. Town of Carbondale et al

Plaintiff: 211 Eighth, LLC and Prince Creek Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Town of Carbondale, Nancy Barnett and John Plano
Counter_claimant: Town of Carbondale, Nancy Barnett and John Plano
Counter_defendant: 211 Eighth, LLC and Prince Creek Construction, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00049
Filed: January 9, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Garfield
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum Brief in Support Thereof 50 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 49 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Testimony of Gary Suiter 34 is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the clerk of the court. This case is REMANDED to the District Court of Garfield County, Colorado. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/11/2013. (kfinn, )
February 12, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Town of Carbondale, John Plano, Nancy Barnett against 211 Eighth, LLC, Prince Creek Construction, Inc. re: 101 Order on Motion in Limine, for Summary Judgment, for Partial Summary Judgment. By Clerk on 2/12/13. (kfinn, )
April 4, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/4/13.(dkals, )
January 23, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/23/2012. (mjwcd)
March 21, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/8/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 2/25/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/21/12. (rebsec, )
August 15, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The scheduling order is modified as set forth in the attached minute order. The discovery cut-off is October 31, 2012. The parties must complete ADR through a private mediation service by October 31, 2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/15/12.(mjgsl, )
September 17, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 19 is modified. Parties' expert witnesses are to be disclosed on or before 9/21/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/17/2012.(mjwcd)
September 21, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 19 is amended. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/21/2012.(mjwcd)
February 4, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 70 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' EIGHTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/4/13. (kfinn, )
February 4, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re Partially Unopposed Motion To Proceed With Video-Conference or Other Electronic Avenues To Ensure Testimony at The Time of Trial, or To Preserve Trial Testimony Via Deposition, or To Proceed With Telephonic Testimony at The Time of Trial 88 . The motion is granted to the extent that defendants can secure a video deposition. The motion is otherwise denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/4/13. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: 211 Eighth, LLC et al v. Town of Carbondale et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 211 Eighth, LLC
Represented By: Karl J. Hanlon
Represented By: James Francis Fosnaught
Represented By: Jeffrey Juergens Conklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Creek Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Karl J. Hanlon
Represented By: James Francis Fosnaught
Represented By: Jeffrey Juergens Conklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Carbondale
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Heidi J. Hugdahl
Represented By: Sean Michael Hanlon
Represented By: Mark Edward Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Barnett
Represented By: Mark Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Heidi J. Hugdahl
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Plano
Represented By: Mark Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Heidi J. Hugdahl
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Town of Carbondale
Represented By: Mark Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Sean Michael Hanlon
Represented By: Heidi J. Hugdahl
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nancy Barnett
Represented By: Mark Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Heidi J. Hugdahl
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: John Plano
Represented By: Mark Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Heidi J. Hugdahl
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: 211 Eighth, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Juergens Conklin
Represented By: James Francis Fosnaught
Represented By: Karl J. Hanlon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Prince Creek Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Juergens Conklin
Represented By: James Francis Fosnaught
Represented By: Karl J. Hanlon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]