Henson et al v. Bank of America

Plaintiff: Mark A. Henson and Suzanne M. Henson
Defendant: Bank of America
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00098
Filed: January 13, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2012. The court TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT 43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The court TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT 34 Motion to Dismiss. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
March 25, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing all claims against Defendant Castle Stawiarksi LLC, and granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/25/13.(dkals, )
February 7, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 3/19/2012 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/7/12. (cbssec)
February 24, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/24/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Henson et al v. Bank of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Henson
Represented By: Matthew R. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M. Henson
Represented By: Matthew R. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Represented By: Melissa Louise Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]