Gabriel v. Wachovia et al

Defendant: Wells Fargo, Douglas County Public Trustee and Wachovia
Plaintiff: Jesse Gabriel
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00106
Filed: January 18, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 19 The Complaint and Ex Parte Motion for Emergency Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order, construed as a motion for preliminary injunction, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/8/2012.(ervsl, )
June 14, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Defendants' Motion to Vacate and Reset the Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2012 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty IS CONVERTED TO A STATUS CONFERENCE. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/14/2012. (mehcd)
November 20, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 40 is ADOPTED in its entirety; This action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. By Judge William J. Martinez on 11/20/2012.(ervsl, )
January 20, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Court construes Plaintiffs Motion to Stay Case as a Motion toWithdraw his Emergency Motion. As so construed, the Court GRANTSPlaintiffs Motion to Stay Case; To the extent Plaintiffs Motion to Stay Case can be interpreted as a motion to form ally stay this action, the Court DENIES the 3 Motion to Stay; Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Emergency Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order ECF No. 1 , is DENIED WITHOUTPREJUDICE as WITHDRAWN; by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/20/2012.(ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gabriel v. Wachovia et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Public Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Gabriel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]