Mbaku et al v. Bank of America, National Association

Plaintiff: Luvibidila Jolie Lumuenemo and John M. Mbaku
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 1:2012cv00190
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Pending De Novo Review by District Court Judge. Discovery in this matter is STAYED until further Order of the Court. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/5/13.(mnfsl, )
January 8, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part 104 Motion to Stay the Dispositive Motion Deadline Pending Decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Their Complaint. The dispositive motion deadline is vacated and will be reset following review by the District J udge of the objections raised by Plaintiffs to the undersigned's 81 Recommendation on Plaintiffs' 39 Second Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/14.(mnfsl, )
January 10, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 81 Report and Recommendations by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/10/14. 39 Second Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) is granted in part. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint in conformance with this Order by 1/23/14. (dkals, )
January 29, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(a) is denied as moot. The 109 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/14.(mfiel, )
August 11, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider Pursuant to Fed. Civ. P. 60(b)(6) and (d) [Docket No. 114] filed by plaintiffs John M. Mbaku and Luvibidila Jolie Lumuenemo is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Second Motion to Reconsider Pursuant to Fed. Civ. P. 60(b)(6) and (d) [Docket No. 120] is DENIED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/11/14.(jhawk, )
August 20, 2014 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 124 Motion to Dismiss; adopting in part and rejecting in part 141 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that the Second [sic] Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief 115 filed by plaintiffs John M. Mbaku and Luvibidila Jolie Lumuenemo is DISMISSED. It is furtherORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/20/2014.(agarc, )
August 20, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to 156 Order by Clerk on 8/20/2014. (agarc, )
January 26, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Until such time as plaintiffs file a motion that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules, the Court will not take up any request for relief found within their complaint. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/26/12. (mnfsl, )
April 12, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/13.(mnfsl, )
May 9, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CERTIFYING MATTER TO THE COLORADO ATTORNEY GENERAL. Plaintiffs' challenge to the constitutionality of Rule 120 of the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure is certified to the Colorado Attorney General. The Clerk of this Court shall forward a copy of this Order, the 1 complaint, and the 26 February 1, 2013 Order, certified under seal, to the Colorado Attorney General. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/9/13. (mnfsl, )
January 27, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/14/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/27/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4) (mnfsl, )
July 3, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/3/13.(pabsec)
July 24, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 59 Notice of On-Going State Court Proceedings and Request for Clarification of July 3, 2013 Order is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/24/13. (mnfsl, )
January 30, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/30/12.(pabsec)
September 27, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Motion Hearing held on 9/27/2013. All discovery is stayed except for the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of the defendant and depositions of plaintiffs. Discovery extended to 11/1 5/2013 for the sole purpose of completing the depositions of plaintiffs and the defendant. Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Bank of America (BOA) is denied without prejudice. The 67 Motion to Quash Pur suant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(c) is granted. The 69 Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) is granted. Plaintiffs' 75 Response Pursuant to D.C. COLO.L CivR. 7.1(c) to Non-Parties' Motion to Quash and Motion for Contempt Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 45(e) is denied to the extent it purports to seek an order of Contempt. If the plaintiffs wish to pursue a Motion for Contempt, they must file a separate motion in accordance with the Local Rules no later than 10/ 4/2013. Plaintiffs' 76 Motion to Compel the Deposition of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (BOA) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' 79 Motion to Compel the Deposition of Mercedes Judilla and Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(d) is denied. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2013. Defendant's Oral Motion to Compel the depositions of the plaintiffs is granted. The plaintiffs must sit for their depositions on or before 11/15/2013. FTR: Laura Galera. (mnfsl, )
October 17, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 90 Motion to Stay Discovery Order Pending De Novo Review by District Court Judge. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/17/13.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mbaku et al v. Bank of America, National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luvibidila Jolie Lumuenemo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Mbaku
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Represented By: Melissa Louise Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]