Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. ResortBanc Financial, Inc.

Counter_claimant: ResortBanc Financial, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: ResortBanc Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00243
Filed: January 30, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/16/2012. (mjwcd)
June 1, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/1/12.(lag, )
June 1, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/1/12. (lag)
September 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Plaintiffs Motion to Join Additional Defendants andfor Leave to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/5/2012.(ervsl, )
January 8, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Plaintiff's Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Fulfillment of Settlement Obligations. This matter is STAYED through and including 5/2/2013. Dismissal Paper due by 5/15/2013. Final Pretrial Conference 3/14/2013 09:30 AM is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/8/2013.(mjwcd)
January 30, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver, signed by Douglas County, District Court Judge, Richard B. Caschette, on 1/24/12. (lygsl, )
January 30, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Civil Case Management ORDER, signed by Douglas County, District Court Judge, Richard Caschette, on 6/29/11. (lygsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. ResortBanc Financial, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: ResortBanc Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Geraldine A. Brimmer
Represented By: Perry L. Glantz
Represented By: John Patrick Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick Harrington
Represented By: Perry L. Glantz
Represented By: Geraldine A. Brimmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ResortBanc Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]