Hendricks et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jack Hendricks and Virginia Hendricks
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00263
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Otero
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 4/5/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order original only delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 3/28/2013, lead counsel present in person, and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd)
March 20, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/20/2013. (rpmcd)
February 14, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Motion to Remand, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/14/2012.(rpmcd)
February 14, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER re: 7 Order Denying Motion to Remand (amended to identify correct defendant) by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/14/2012. (rpmcd )
March 22, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/27/2012 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 19, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/22/2012. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Hendricks
Represented By: William Wayne Muhr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Hendricks
Represented By: William Wayne Muhr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin R. Anderson
Represented By: Larry S. McClung
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]