Sonnenberg et al v. Sipf et al

Plaintiff: American Financial Security Holdings, Inc., Carol Sonnenberg and Michael Sonnenberg
Defendant: Eric David Sipf, Stephen S. S. Hyde, Stephen O. James, David C. Baker, Tamara S. Keffeler and Firstbank Holding Company
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00441
Filed: February 21, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Plaintiffs and Defendant Stephen O. James Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims with Prejudice. it is ORDERED that the Motion ECF No. 90 is hereby GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that all of Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Stephen O. James are DISMISSED with prejudice; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Stephen O. James first and second third- party claims for relief against John C. Herbers, Robert Ruiz-Moss and James Lubrinski are DISMISSED with prejudice; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Stephen O. James third third-party claim for relief against Thomas Keller, Craig Magnuson and Magnum Actuarial Group, LLC is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party as between them to bear their or its own costs, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/14/2013.(ervsl, )
July 16, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Third-Party Plaintiff Stephen O. James' Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Third-Party Defendants Herbers, Ruiz-Moss and Lubinski With Prejudice and Against Third-Party Defendants Keller, Magnuson and Magnum Actuarial Gro up, LLC Without Prejudice. Upon review of the Motion and being otherwise fully advised, it is ORDERED that the Motion (ECF No. 100 ) is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Third-Party Plaintiff James' remaining third-party claims again st third-party defendants Herbers, Ruiz-Moss and Lubinski are DISMISSED with prejudice; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Third-Party Plaintiff James' remaining third-party claims against third-party defendants Keller, Magnuson and Magnum Actuar ial Group, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that third-party defendants Kelly, Magnuson and Magnum Actuarial Group, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 99 ) is MOOT as to Third-Party Plaintiff James ONLY; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that there being no remaining claims against or third-party claims by Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff James, his name shall be removed from the caption of this action in all future filings with the Court. Each party is to bear his or its own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/16/13. (alvsl)
October 17, 2013 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. FirstBank's Motion for Leave to File Its Supplemental Designation of Non-Parties at Fault Pursuant to C.R.S. § 13-21-111.5 95 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint 128 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 128-1), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/17/13. (sgrim)
October 17, 2013 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Leave. Defendants Sipf and Hyde may file their Supplemental Designation of Nonparties at Fault no later than October 22, 2013. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/17/2013.(trlee, )
October 24, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 162 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Plaintiffs against FirstBank Holding Company, David C. Baker, and Tamara S. Keffeler are dismissed with prejudice. Each party as between Plaintiffs and the FirstBank Defendants will be ar its own attorneys fees and costs incurred in connection with this action; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that there being no remaining claims against the FirstBank Defendants, their names shall be removed from the caption of this action in all future filings with the Court. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/24/2013.(trlee, )
November 27, 2013 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 178 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims with Prejudice and Certain Claims without Prejudice by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/27/13.(dkals, )
November 27, 2013 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 179 Motion To Dismiss Fifth Claim For Relief In Third-Party Complaint by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/27/13.(dkals, )
January 3, 2014 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resetting the Trial Preparation Conference to 1/13/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/3/2014. (trlee, )
January 14, 2014 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 190 Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing for 99 and 165 is set for 1/30/2014, 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/14/2014.(trlee, )
January 30, 2014 249 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2014 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Third-party defendant Ruiz-Moss makes oral Motion to Join Third-Party Defendant John Herbers' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants the oral Motion to Join. The Court takes under advisement 99 Motion for Summary Judgment and 165 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (rmcd)
February 13, 2014 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 166 Motion for Summary Judgment, 186 Motion to Strike, 217 Motion to Exclude. Granting 250 Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Eric David Sipf are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear their or his own costs. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/13/2014.(trlee, )
November 27, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/27/2012. Denying 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Granting 59 Motion for Costs. Discovery due by 9/21/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2013. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/8/2014 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom A902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2014 9:00 AM in Courtroom A902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
November 28, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a two-week jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on January 21, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for January 8, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/28/2012. (rbjsec. )
February 23, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson)no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/23/2012. (rbjsec. )
April 8, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Third-Party Plaintiff Eric Sipf's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Claims Against James Lubinski. Third-Party Plaintiff Eric Sipf's claims against Third-Party Defendant James Lubinski are dismissed with prejudice. Mr. Sipf and Mr. James are to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/08/13. (alvsl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sonnenberg et al v. Sipf et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Financial Security Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Harrison Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Sonnenberg
Represented By: Donald Harrison Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sonnenberg
Represented By: Donald Harrison Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric David Sipf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S. S. Hyde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen O. James
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara S. Keffeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstbank Holding Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]