Tatten v. Bank of America Corporation et al

Plaintiff: James P. Tatten
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP and Brian T. Moynihan
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00459
Filed: February 22, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2012 16 Featured Case SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2012 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/28/2012. (kmtcd)
June 19, 2012 26 Featured Case CIVIL TRIAL PROCEDURES ORDER Three-day Jury Trial set for 4/15/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/15/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/19/2012. (kmtcd)
December 17, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/17/12 GRANTING 27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiff may file, within twenty days of this Order, a motion to amend the complaint, along with a proposed Amended Complaint asserting only the fraudulent misrepresentation claim and the breach of contract claim related to the loan modification agreement. The court will withhold entering final judgment at this time.(nmmsl, )
January 7, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleading. On or before 1/17/2013, Plaintiff may file a renewed motion to amend his complaint in accordance with this court's Order of December 17, 2012. The court will withhold entering final judgment at this time. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/13.(mnfsl, )
February 5, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleadings, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/05/13. The Clerk shall file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 36-1).(nmmsl, )
February 22, 2013 47 Featured Case CIVIL TRIAL PROCEDURES ORDER Three-day Jury Trial set for 11/18/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/22/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/22/2013. (kmtcd)
August 21, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) 44 is GRANTED. Judgment shall enter in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff on all claims for relief and causes of action asserted in this case. Defendants are awarded their costs to be taxed by the Clerk of Court. This case is CLOSED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/21/13.(sgrim)
August 21, 2013 54 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 53 Order. By Clerk on 8/21/13. (mnfsl, )
February 22, 2012 5 Featured Case Minute ORDER by Denver District Court Judge R. Michael Mullins on 2/06/12. (agarc, )
February 27, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/27/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tatten v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Tatten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Louise Morris
Represented By: Anne Marie Mangiardi
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Represented By: Anne Marie Mangiardi
Represented By: Melissa Louise Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Represented By: Anne Marie Mangiardi
Represented By: Melissa Louise Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T. Moynihan
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Represented By: Anne Marie Mangiardi
Represented By: Melissa Louise Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]