Kennedy et al v. McCormick et al

Defendant: Robert Barber, Lawrence Wexler and Michael McCormick
Plaintiff: Beverly Kennedy and Kennedy Farms, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00561
Filed: March 2, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Defendant Michael McCormick's Opposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Determination of Motions to Dismiss. A temporary stay of discovery is entered for a period of three months. Status Conference set for 8/23/2012 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/24/2012. (mehcd)
June 4, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/19/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 5/13/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/4/12. (rebsec, )
September 10, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/12/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/10/12. (rebsec, )
October 9, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint and Jury Demand. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/9/12.(kfinn, )
October 26, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 17 Defendants', Robert Barber, D.V.M. and Lawrence Wexler, D.V.M., Motion To Dismiss; denying as moot 18 Defendant Michael J. McCormick's Motion To Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/26/12. (kfinn, )
January 14, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Combined Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery and All Proceedings in Light of Recommendation of Dismissal. The parties shall file a status report within three business days of receiving a ruling on the motions to dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/14/13. (kfinn, )
January 24, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Stipulated Motion To Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/24/13. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kennedy et al v. McCormick et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barber
Represented By: Michelle R. Prud'Homme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Wexler
Represented By: Michelle R. Prud'Homme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Kennedy
Represented By: Tobin Duff Kern
Represented By: Thomas Randolph Catanese
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennedy Farms, LLC
Represented By: Tobin Duff Kern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]