Wyers, et al v. Greenberg Traurig, LLP et al

Plaintiff: Philip W. Wyers and Wyers Products Group, Inc.
Defendant: Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Mark L. Hogge, Laura M. Klaus and Robert P. Charrow
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00750
Filed: March 26, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that a five-day jury trial is set to commence on Monday, August11, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-1002. Further, a Trial Preparation Conference is set for Tuesday, July 15, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Mot ion For Summary Judgment Regarding Admissibility Of Evidence Of Mediation Communications 79 and the Defendants' Motion To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Melinda M. Harper 121 Denied Without Prejudice. ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Mo tion To Extend Briefing Deadlines 127 is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. The Plaintiffs' shall respond to the Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment 123 on or before Friday, December 20, 2013 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/09/13.(jjhsl, )
March 30, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 5/18/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/30/12. (cbssec)
June 13, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 123 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/3/2014.(evana, )
December 12, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants' Objection To Magistrate Judge's Order Re: Defendants' Motion To Strike, Restrict Public Access, And For Extension To Answer 25 , is OVERRULED. The Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before Friday , December 21, 2012. ORDERED that the original complaint 5 shall remain on the record and shall remain restricted at Level 1. ORDERED that the defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before Wednesday, January 2, 2013. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion To Stay Consideration Of Portion Of Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss And Renewed Motion To Strike 30 , is DENIED AS MOOT by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/12/12.(jjhsl, )
December 27, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 12/27/2012. The court DENIES without prejudice 51 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
March 26, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Time to File Return of Service by Norman D. Haglund, District Court Judge on 03/12/12. (johar, )
February 6, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion to Dismiss and Renewed Motion to Strike and granting 50 Motion. Section D of December 12, 2012, Order [ECF No. 47 ] entitled "The Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint is STRICKEN from the Order as it was previously worded. December 12, 2012, Order shall be restricted at Level 1 restriction. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/6/13.(mjgsl, )
February 20, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2013. The court GRANTS 57 Motion for Leave. The court GRANTS 68 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The new discovery deadlines are as fo llows: discovery cut off is July 9, 2013; dispositive motions deadline is July 15, 2013; affirmative experts shall be designated no later than May 7, 2013; and rebuttal experts shall be designated no later than June 7, 2013. A Final Pretrial Con ference is set for November 14, 2013 at 9:15 a.m. Final Pretrial Order is due no later than SEVEN (7) CALENDAR DAYS before the Final Pretrial Conference. (See the court's website for instructions for Preparation and Submission) FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wyers, et al v. Greenberg Traurig, LLP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip W. Wyers
Represented By: R. Parker Semler
Represented By: Andrew Gerhard Oh-Willeke
Represented By: Matthew Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyers Products Group, Inc.
Represented By: R. Parker Semler
Represented By: Andrew Gerhard Oh-Willeke
Represented By: Matthew Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenberg Traurig, LLP
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Hutchinson
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Hogge
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Hutchinson
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura M. Klaus
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Hutchinson
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Charrow
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Hutchinson
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]