SKS Investments Ltd., Corp. v. Gilman Metals Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: SKS Investments Ltd., Corp.
Defendant: Gilman Metals Company, LLC and Richard Galvin
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00806
Filed: March 29, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Standing Order for Any Settlement Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/7/2012. (eseam)
January 23, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. I GRANT IN PART and DENY IN PART, the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Breach of Contract Claim 12 , and I ENTER PARTIAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff SKS Investments, and against Defendant Gilman Metals Company, LLC, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/23/13.(sgrim)
January 28, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Judgment. The Order and Judgment 28 is vacated and set aside, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/28/2013. (eseam)
January 29, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss Claims. This matter is administratively closed. The case remains subject to reopening for good cause, until payment has been made in full, at which point Plaintiff is ordered to file notice and a stipulated motion to close the case, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/29/2013. (eseam)
March 27, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Entry of Judgment granting 33 Motion for Entry of Judgment by Confession. JUDGMENT shall enter in favor of Plaintiff SKS Investments, Ltd., Corp., and jointly and severally against Defendants Gilman Metals Company, LLC, and Richard Galvin, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/27/13.(sgrim)
March 29, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT re: 34 Order on Motion for Judgment, by Clerk on 3/29/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SKS Investments Ltd., Corp. v. Gilman Metals Company, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKS Investments Ltd., Corp.
Represented By: Kathryn A. Reilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilman Metals Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Galvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]