Patrick Collins, Inc. v. John Does 1-6

Defendant: John Does 1-6
Plaintiff: Patrick Collins, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00849
Filed: April 3, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/9/2012. (mehcd)
June 4, 2012 20 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Defendant John Doe #6's Amended Motion to Drop Him From the Case, With Incorporated Authority, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/4/2012. (mehcd)
June 18, 2012 26 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 22 the Unopposed Motion to Proceed Anonymously for the Limited Purpose of Filing a Motion to Drop, with Incorporated Authority, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/18/2012. (mehcd)
November 19, 2012 66 Featured Case ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 60 RECOMMENDATION. Defendant John Doe #6's 23 Resubmitted Motion to Drop Him from the Case is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/19/12.(mnfsl, )
April 5, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/2/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (mnfsl, )
April 6, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER Of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty is hereby substituted as the presiding Magistrate Judge in each of the above-referenced cases by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/06/12. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Patrick Collins, Inc. v. John Does 1-6
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-6
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Collins, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]