Raw Films, Ltd. v. John Does 2-9

Plaintiff: Raw Films, Ltd.
Defendant: John Does 1-9
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00909
Filed: April 5, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/12.(mjgsl, )
June 18, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO JOHN DOE 1, ONLY re: 15 Notice of Dismissal of Party John Doe 1, Only, with prejudice by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/18/2012. (dbrow, )
July 9, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO JOHN DOE 5, ONLY, Approving 17 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Raw Films, Ltd. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/9/12. (mjgsl, )
August 1, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO JOHN DOE 4, ONLY APPROVING 19 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Raw Films, Ltd. Plaintiff's claims against defendant John Doe 4 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/1/12. (mjgsl, )
August 6, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Of DISMISSAL APPROVING 21 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Remaining John Does. Plaintiff's claims against all the remaining John Does are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/6/12. (mjgsl, )
October 26, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: 24 Notice of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Doe 9 filed by Raw Films, Ltd. Plaintiff's claims against John Doe 9 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/26/12. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Raw Films, Ltd. v. John Does 2-9
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raw Films, Ltd.
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-9
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]