Mains v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Richard D. Mains
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00917
Filed: April 6, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/31/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 6/17/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/5/12. (rebsec, )
April 19, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion To Continue Trial; Trial Preparation Conference set for May 31, 2013, and the jury trial set to commence June 17, 2013, are VACATED and are CONTINUED pending further order of court; That on April 25, 2013, commencing at 10:00 a.m., the court shall conduct a telephonic setting conference to reset the Trial Preparation Conference and jury trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/19/13. (kfinn, )
April 24, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice 24 is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay its attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/24/13. (mjgsl, )
April 9, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 6/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/9/12. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mains v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. Mains
Represented By: Duane Matthew Dreesen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Torriano N. Garland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]