Zahourek Systems, Inc. v. Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.

Thirdparty_defendant: Jon Zahourek
Plaintiff: Zahourek Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Zahourek Systems, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Jon Zahourek
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00978
Filed: April 12, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 09:4
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2012 26 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Defendant-Counterplaintiff Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.'s Motion to Accept Response to Jon Zahourek, Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Filed Out of Time 25 is GRANTED and the Response 22 is accepted for filing, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/5/12.(sgrim)
November 27, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Third-Party Defendant Jon Zahourek's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.'s claims against Mr. Zahourek are dismissed without prejudice for improper joinder, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/27/2012. (eseam)
November 27, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER denying 18 Mr. Zahourek's Motion for Relief, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/27/2012. (eseam)
June 14, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1 Zahourek's Verified Petition to Compel Arbitration under the FAA. The claims in this case shall be submitted to arbitration as provided for in the Product License Agreement. Zahourek's request for attorney fees is denied. Zahourek may renew its request that the Court appoint an arbitrator if the parties are unable to agree on one within 15 days of the date of this Order, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/14/2013. (eseam)
July 31, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER denying 33 Motion to Appoint Charles Mudd Arbitrator and granting 34 Renewed Request to Appoint Arbitrator by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/31/13.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zahourek Systems, Inc. v. Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Jon Zahourek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahourek Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Luke Robert Santangelo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Frederic Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Frederic Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Zahourek Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Luke Robert Santangelo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jon Zahourek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Canine Rehabilitation Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Frederic Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]