American Enterprise Bank, v. Spring Hill Holdings LLC, et al.,

Plaintiff: American Enterprise Bank
Defendant: Spring Hill Holdings, LLC, Gemini Fitness Group, Inc., Ainslee MacEachran, Hugh MacEachran, Elizabeth MacEachran, John MacEachran, Small Business Administration, Waterbury Orchards, LLC and Public Trustee of Larimer County
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01032
Filed: April 17, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/8/2012. (mjwcd)
October 22, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion to Amended Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 40 is amended. Discovery due by 1/2/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set 2/12/2013 10:00 AM is vacated. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/25/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/22/2012.(mjwcd)
March 20, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference 4/1/2013 09:30 AM is vacated. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/17/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/20/2013.(mjwcd)
April 8, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/8/2013. Granting 65 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Vacate the Final Pretrial Conference. Discovery due by 8/9/2013. Dispositive Motions due b y 10/31/2013. Initial experts shall be disclosed on or before 6/24/2013. Rebuttal experts shall be disclosed on or before 7/22/2013. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 12/9/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2013. FTR: Emily Seamon. (eseam)
June 21, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Unopposed Joint Motion to Stay Litigation for 60 Days Based Upon Pending Settlement and Approval. This case, including the deadlines set forth in the amendedScheduling Order, is stayed up to and including 8/20/2013. Status Report due by 8/20/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/20/2013.(mjwcd)
August 19, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting the Parties 78 Joint Motion Requesting Administrative Closure of the Case, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/19/2013. (ervsl, )
March 5, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 judgment of foreclosure, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/5/20014. (trlee, )
March 5, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 83 Order. by Clerk on 3/5/2014. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: American Enterprise Bank, v. Spring Hill Holdings LLC, et al.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Enterprise Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Esses
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Hill Holdings, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Fitness Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ainslee MacEachran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh MacEachran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth MacEachran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John MacEachran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterbury Orchards, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Trustee of Larimer County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]