Shinn, et al v. Melberg

Plaintiff: Michael Shinn and Jennifer Shinn
Defendant: Mark W. Melberg, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01180
Filed: May 7, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Standing Order for any Settlement Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/7/2012. (eseam)
January 11, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer to the Complaint. Defendant's First Amended Answer shall be accepted for filing, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/11/2013. (eseam)
April 12, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Defendant's Motion for Stay Pending Related State Appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/12/2013. (eseam)
May 1, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Medical Battery Claims. I DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiffs' First and Second Claims for Relief as barred by the applicable statute of limitations, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/1/13.(sgrim)
June 17, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Defendant's Motion for Stay of Expert Disclosure Deadline Pending Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/17/2013. (eseam)
October 24, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Striking 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/24/2013. (eseam)
December 9, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 64 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Pleading #1, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/9/2013. (eseam)
January 15, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Response filed on January 9, 2014 by Defendant, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/15/2014. (eseam)
January 30, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 42 Plaintiffs' Motion to Accept the $4,200,000.00 City and County of Denver, Colorado Judgment. Granting 37 Defendant's first Motion for Summary Judgment in his favor. Denying as moot 48 Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 71 Plaintiffs' First Amendment to Supplemental Pleading #1 to Amend the Complaint. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant on all Plaintiffs' claims. This case is dismissed. Costs are awarded to Defendant, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/30/2014. (eseam)
February 12, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File the Motion for Reconsideration to the Court Order of January 30, 2014. The attached Motion for Reconsideration (Doc 82-1) is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/12/2014. (eseam)
June 13, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Claim for Relief - Outrageous Conduct. It is ordered that Plaintiff's Fifth Claim for Relief - Outrageous Conduct is dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/13/2012. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinn, et al v. Melberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shinn
Represented By: Declan Joseph O'Donnell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Shinn
Represented By: Declan Joseph O'Donnell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark W. Melberg, M.D.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]