Hughes v. Flagstar Bank, FSB et al

Plaintiff: Karen Hughes
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB, Flagstar Bancorp, Inc., Public Trustee, Routt County, Colorado and Fred Hughes
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01267
Filed: May 14, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Routt
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 10 Joint Motion to Deposit Funds Into the Registry of the Court is granted. Plaintiff Karen Hughes shall deposit $4500.00 in the Court Registry Investment System pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 67.2. Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is withdrawn. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/18/12.(mnfsl, )
May 22, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/22/2012. (kmtcd)
June 14, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Motion Hearing held on 6/14/2012. Order denying 18 Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter: Janet Coppock) (pabcd)
July 3, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 43 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. Only is converted into a Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) and is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all of plaintiff's claims against defendant Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/3/12. (mnfsl, )
August 16, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING DEFENDANT PUBLIC TRUSTEE FROM PARTICIPATION IN ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION AND TRIAL, AND FROM COMPLIANCE WITH FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 AND 26 re: 60 Motion. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/16/12.(mnfsl, )
September 19, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB's Motion to Stay Proceedings Due to Bankruptcy Filing. This case is stayed unless and until relief from the automatic stay is granted. All deadlines and hearings set in this matter are va cated. Plaintiff is ordered to file a status report in this case within ten days of any relief from the stay in the bankruptcy case. Additionally, Plaintiff must serve Defendant Fred Hughes with process within 30 days of the lifting of the bankruptcy stay. The 70 Order to Show Cause is discharged. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/19/12.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hughes v. Flagstar Bank, FSB et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hughes
Represented By: Mark William Hofgard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Roy W. Penny, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Roy W. Penny, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Trustee, Routt County, Colorado
Represented By: John David Merrill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Hughes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]