Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment et al v. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement et al

Defendant: Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, Kenneth L. Salazar, Al Klein, Bob Postle, Rick Williamson and Mychal Yellowman
Plaintiff: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity and Amigos Bravos
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01275
Filed: May 15, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:4331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Intervene. The clerk shall enter the answer attached as Exhibit 1 to their Motion to Intervene, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/24/12.(sgrim)
August 24, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Petition for Review of Agency Action, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/24/12. (sgrim) (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/24/2012 due to typographical error) (sgrim).
January 4, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/4/13.(mjgsl, )
August 22, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Complete the Administrative Record and 46 Motion for Additional Time to File Merits Briefs. Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/30/2013. Adm Defendants Brief due by 10/25/2013. Adm Intervenor Defendants Brief due by 11/4/2013. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 11/19/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 8/22/13.(mnfsl, )
October 8, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A STAY OF MERITS BRIEFING SCHEDULE, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/8/2013.(trlee, )
October 21, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Joint Case Management Order for Petition for Review of Agency Action by Judge John L. Kane on 10/21/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment et al v. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement
Represented By: Peter James McVeigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Salazar
Represented By: Peter James McVeigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Klein
Represented By: Peter James McVeigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Postle
Represented By: Peter James McVeigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Williamson
Represented By: Peter James McVeigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mychal Yellowman
Represented By: Peter James McVeigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juan Citizens Alliance
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amigos Bravos
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]