Cady et al v. Rickly et al

Plaintiff: Jill Cady and James Cady
Defendant: Sandy Rickly
Case Number: 1:2012cv01418
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the 23 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/13/2013. (eseam)
August 7, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Standing Order for any Settlement Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/7/2012. (eseam)
August 15, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint to Name Matt Rickly as the Sole Defendant, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/15/12.(lygsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cady et al v. Rickly et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Cady
Represented By: Russell Ray Hatten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cady
Represented By: Russell Ray Hatten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Rickly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]