Zevalking et al v. Chase Home Finance

Plaintiff: Richard Baron Zevalking IV and Sharron Gayle
Defendant: Chase Home Finance
Case Number: 1:2012cv01422
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/31/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/7/12. (cbssec)
January 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 1/25/2013. The court shall extend the discovery cut off to April 5, 2013; the dispositive motions deadline is extended to April 30, 2013; the Fi nal Pretrial Conference shall be rescheduled to June 27, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file their proposed Final Pretrial Order (and also email an editable version to Shaffer_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov) on or before June 20, 2013. The co urt GRANTS 21 Motion to Compel. The plaintiffs' shall respond (in accordance with Rule 30, Rule 26, and all other Federal Rules of Civil Procedure) no later than 3 weeks from today's date. The court GRANTS 27 Motion to Compel. The plaintiffs' shall be required to appear for any properly noticed depositions set by the defendant. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
October 23, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 57 RECOMMENDATION. Defendant;s 39 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. This case is dismissed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/23/13.(mnfsl, )
October 31, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 58 Order. By Clerk on 10/31/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zevalking et al v. Chase Home Finance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Baron Zevalking IV
Represented By: Trocon Edward Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron Gayle
Represented By: Trocon Edward Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]