Steele Street Bank & Trust v. Staples et al

Plaintiff: Steele Street Bank & Trust
Defendant: Pelham Staples and Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado
Case Number: 1:2012cv01505
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Caption. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove "Centura Health" from the description of Defendant Catholic Health Initiatives of Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/29/2012. (mehcd)
September 12, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/12/12.(dkals, )
October 15, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 33 the Second Stipulated Motion for Protective Order Re: Protected Health Information, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/15/2012. (mehcd)
October 15, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/15/2012. (mehcd)
April 10, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Joint Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend Deadline for Expert Disclosures. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/10/13.(dkals, )
April 30, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Special ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge granting 45 Stipulated Motionfor Hearing/Conference: this action is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for settlement purposes, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/30/13. (dkals, )
May 1, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Unopposed Motion for Joinder of Additional Defendant: Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint by 5/3/13, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/1/13.(dkals, )
July 19, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 69 the Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Disclosures filed by Defendants Pelham Staples, IV and Scott Staples, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/19/2013. (mehcd)
September 16, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case for Trial. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 7/18/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A 10-Day Jury Trial is set for 8/18/2014 09:00 AM, 8/19/2014 09:00 AM, 8/20/2014 09:00 AM, 8/21/2014 09:00 AM, 8/22/2014 09:00 AM, 8/25/2014 09:00 AM, 8/26/2014 09:00 AM, 8/27/2014 09:00 AM, 8/28/2014 09:00 AM, 8/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/16/13. (alvsl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele Street Bank & Trust v. Staples et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steele Street Bank & Trust
Represented By: Paul M. Mahoney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelham Staples
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]