Bassett v. Wild West Balloon Adventures et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy R. Bassett
Defendant: Wild West Balloon Adventures, Inc. and Ian J. Cox
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01514
Filed: June 12, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/17/2012.(ervsl, )
January 16, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 the Parties Stipulated Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay her, his or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/16/2013.(ervsl, )
June 18, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2012 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/18/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bassett v. Wild West Balloon Adventures et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy R. Bassett
Represented By: Donald L. Salem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild West Balloon Adventures, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian J. Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]