Martin et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Van A. Martin and Elizabeth I. Martin
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01593
Filed: June 19, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2012 15 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2013 02:30 PM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/20/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 10/7/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/14/12. (rebsec, )
January 17, 2013 32 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Arthur K. Smith's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/17/13. (kfinn, )
January 25, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Strike Defendant's Designation of Non-Parties at Fault. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/25/2013. (kfinn, )
March 13, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. 37 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice [# 37 ] is approved. This action is Dismissed with Prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/13/2013. (klyon, )
June 21, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/21/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Martin et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van A. Martin
Represented By: Thomas J. Young, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Dickinson Burg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth I. Martin
Represented By: Charles Dickinson Burg
Represented By: Thomas J. Young, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Kittredge Smith, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]