In re: Evans

Appellee: Bank of New York, The
Interested_party: Jeffrey L. Hill, United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
In_re: Patricia Evans
Appellant: Patricia Evans
Case Number: 1:2012cv01596
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Motion to Dismiss and Extending Time for Merits Briefing. Appellee Brief due by 11/5/2012. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/3/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/24/12.(sgrim)
March 28, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismisssing Appeal in Part and Otherwise Affirming 5/17/12 Order and Judgment of the United States Bankruptcy Court: Debtor/Appellant Patricia Evans is to Show Cause by 4/8/2013 why attorney fees and costs should not be assessed against her. This case is dismissed. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/28/13. (dkals, )
June 20, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Appellant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/20/12. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of New York, The
Represented By: Christopher T. Groen
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Fisher
Represented By: Deanna L. Westfall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: Jeffrey L. Hill
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: U.S. Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Patricia Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patricia Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]