Gasco Energy, Inc. v. Environmental Protection Agency

Plaintiff: Gasco Energy, Inc.
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01658
Filed: June 25, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Petition for Review of Agency Action. Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 2/1/2013. Adm Defendants Brief due by 3/4/2013. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 3/19/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/2/12. (sgrim)
December 6, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Terminating AP Docket Designation and for Early Assignment to Merits Judge Under D.C.COLO.LCIV.R 40.1B, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/6/12. (sgrim)
June 25, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2013. 14 Motion for Modification of Case Management Plan and for Setting a Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 8/1/13. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
June 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 14 MOTION for Modification of Case Management Plan and for Setting a Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 8/1/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/25/13. (bnbcd, )
August 16, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/16/13. (msksec, )
September 4, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2013. Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
September 4, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 MOTION to Intervene by Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/4/2013. (klyon, )
September 4, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/4/13. (bnbcd, )
October 18, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Stay Briefing. Motion to Expedite [Doc. # 58 ] is DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/18/2013.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gasco Energy, Inc. v. Environmental Protection Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gasco Energy, Inc.
Represented By: L. Poe Leggette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Alan David Greenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]