Stroeder v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Terri Lynn Stroeder
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Chase Home Finance LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01743
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Plaintiffs Motion to Postpone Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference Reset for 10/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/18/2012.(ervsl, )
September 28, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 28 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Rule 26 Disclosures Late, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/28/2012.(ervsl, )
March 12, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 34 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint under 12 (b)(6) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Plaintiffs Slander of Credit (Count 2), Fraud (Cou nt 5) and Outrageous Conduct (Count 7) Claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 12(b)(6); and This action remains pending as to Plaintiffs Slander of Title (Count 1), Patterns and Practice and Breach of Contract (Count 3), Negligence (Count 4), Defamation (Count 6), and Quiet Title (Count 8) Claims only, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/12/2013.(ervsl, )
October 31, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 49 the parties Joint and Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Discovery Cut-off Date, Deadline to Designate Rebuttal Experts, and Dispositive Motion Deadline. Discovery due by 11/22/2013; Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2013, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/31/2013.(ervsl, )
November 21, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Joint and Unopposed Motion for Second Amendment to Scheduling Order Regarding Discovery Cut-off Date, Deadline to Designate Rebuttal Experts, and Dispositive Motion Deadline by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/13. Discovery is due by 2/17/2014. Dispositive Motions are due by 3/14/2014. A Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 5/22/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference is reset to 5/29/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(dkals, )
November 21, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Motion for Protective Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Protective Order [#55-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/13.(lag)
November 21, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/13. (lag)
February 18, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/18/14 granting 61 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Discovery Deadline to Permit Deposition of Plaintiff's Designated Expert. Discovery Deadline extended to 2 /24/2014 for the limited purpose of allowing Defendants to depose Plaintiff's designated expert. (lag)
July 9, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. A Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix F, # 2 Appendix F.1., # 3 Appendix M, # 4 Pro Se) (sahsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroeder v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lynn Stroeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Represented By: Adam Leon Hirsch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Adam Leon Hirsch
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]