Wade v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Patrick G. Wade
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01772
Filed: July 9, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict And For New Trial and 101 Motion to Review Rule 54(d) Taxed Bill of Costs by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/13/14.(dkals, )
June 26, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case for Trial. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 11/8/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A five-day Jury Trial is set for 12/2/2013 09:00 AM, 12/3/2013 09:00 AM, 12/4/2013 09:00 AM, 12/5/2013 09:00 AM, and 12/6/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/26/13. (alvsl)
November 15, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 54 Motion in Limine. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/15/2013.(trlee, )
November 26, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion in Limine, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/263/2013.(trlee, )
November 27, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 48 Motion In Limine To Prohibit Evidence or Argument Concerning Assumption of Risk and Union Pacifics Empowerment Rule by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/27/13.(dkals, )
August 6, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 10/11/2012 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/6/12. (cbssec)
December 9, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/9/2013. (rmcd)
December 9, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Union Pacific Railroad Company against Patrick G. Wade. by Clerk on 12/9/2013. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wade v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick G. Wade
Represented By: Donald Francis D'Antuono
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]