Minck v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Raymond A. Minck, III
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv01788
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a seven-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on August 5, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for July 17, 2013 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/18/2012. (rbjsec. )
May 21, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2013. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Compel Disclosure 23 is GRANTED as to request at No. 4, "A complete copy of each and every document provided to Dr. Kleiner by Plaintiff Raymond A. Minck, III or Plaintiff's counsel, regarding the defendant." The Motion is DENIED in all other respects.Conference concluded. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (wjmcd, )
July 12, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/12/2012. (rbjsec. )
July 17, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Trial Preparation Conference held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/17/2013. Denied as moot 41 Motion for Contempt; Denied as moot 43 Motion to Stay; Denying 49 Motion in Limine; Granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion in Limine; Denying without prejudice 54 Motion in Limine. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
November 26, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Daubert Hearing held on 11/26/2013. 28 Defendant's Motion to Strike Parts of Dr. Johanning's Expert Testimony Pursuant to F.R.E. 702 is GRANTED. 29 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claimed Neck or Cervical Spine Injuries is GRANTED. 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 51 Motion to Strike Dr. Jeffrey Kleiner's Expert Testimony Pursuant to F.R.E. 702 is DENIED. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (rbjcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minck v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Minck, III
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Represented By: Fredric A. Bremseth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Chad Michael Knight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]