Garcia v. IRS, Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Lilia E. Garcia
Defendant: IRS, Internal Revenue Service
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01824
Filed: July 12, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Adivsement to Pro Se Plaintiffs. Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/25/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment #1, # 2 Attachment #2, # 3 Attachment #3, # 4 Attachment #4) (sgrim)
March 24, 2013 125 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER; In light of the Court's Recommendation 124 that this actions be dismissed, Plaintiff's Motions 28 35 41 42 48 50 52 60 62 67 70 71 74 75 76 90 are DENIED AS MOOT, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/24/2013.(klmcd, )
August 17, 2012 12 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before September 4, 2012 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/17/12.(jjhsl, )
July 15, 2013 153 Featured Case ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Mix's Recommendation 124 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Garcias Answer To Order To Show Cause And Motion To Request A Hearing 97 is DENIED. ORDERED that pursuant to FED. R. CIV. 41(b), Garcia's claims against the IRS are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/15/13.(jjhsl, )
July 16, 2013 154 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that pursuant to FED. R. CIV. 41(b), Garcia's claims against the IRS are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders by Clerk on 07/16/13. (jjhsl, )
October 11, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. ORDERED that the Motion to Consolidate by Defendant filed in Civil Action No. 12-cv-01824-WYD-KLM (ECF No. 19) is GRANTED. Lilia E. Garcia v. Internal Revenue Service, Civil Action No. 12-cv-02482-WY D-KMT, is consolidated with 12-cv-01842-WYD-KLM for all further purposes. ORDERED that as of the date of this Order, all pleadings and other filings shall be filed in Civil Action No. 12-cv-01824, using the caption appearing in this Order. ORDERED that Civil Action No. 12-cv-02482 shall hereafter be referred to the magistrate judge assigned to the lowest case, in this case Magistrate Judge Mix by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/11/12.(jjhsl, )
November 1, 2012 63 Featured Case ORDER; 14 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and the Motion for More Definite Statement [Doc. No. 10 of 12-cv-02482-WYD-KLM] are GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint on or before 11/21/2012. Failure to file a Second Amended Complaint by that date or satisfy the standards set forth in this Order for presenting claims may result in a recommendation for dismissal of this action. The Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2012 is VACATED. The Court will re-set the Scheduling Conference, if necessary, after Plaintiff files a Second Amended Complaint in compliance with this Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/1/2012.(klmcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Garcia v. IRS, Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilia E. Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]