Carskadon v. Diva International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Susan K Carskadon
Defendant: Diva International, Inc., Francine Chambers and Carinne Chambers
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01886
Filed: July 19, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2013 28 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/15/2013.(klyon, )
January 17, 2013 32 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/17/13. (msksec, )
May 3, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants' "Motion for Dismissal, Fees, and Costs under Rule 41(b)"(Doc. No. 50 ) is DENIED and Plaintiff's "Motion to Allow Third Amended Complaint and Jury Demand" (Doc. No. 41 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 33 ) and Defendants' Motion to Stay (Doc. No. 35 ), the latter of which is premised entirely on arguments raised in the former, are DENIED without prejudice as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/3/2013.(klyon, )
May 3, 2013 57 Featured Case AMENDED 55 ORDER. Order Amended to correct Judge's initials in the case caption only. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/3/2013. (klyon, )
June 14, 2013 66 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Discovery in this case is STAYED until ruling on "Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and (6)" (Doc. No. 58 ). No later than seven (7) days after ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, should any portion of this case remain pending, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising the court whether the stay should be lifted. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/14/13. (alvsl)
August 3, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/3/2012. (kmtcd)
October 10, 2012 7 Featured Case SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/10/2012. (kmtcd)
October 19, 2012 9 Featured Case THIRD ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/19/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carskadon v. Diva International, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan K Carskadon
Represented By: James L. Abrams
Represented By: Robert L. Allman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diva International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francine Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carinne Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]