Tillotson v. Hawkins

Defendant: Mike Hawkins
Plaintiff: Chris Tillotson
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02012
Filed: August 1, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 10 Featured Case Minute ORDER denying 9 request to reopen this action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/28/12.(lygsl, )
September 26, 2012 12 Featured Case Minute ORDER denying 11 (Motion) letter requesting to Reopen Case, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/26/12.(lygsl, )
October 5, 2012 14 Featured Case Minute ORDER denying 13 request to reopen this action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/5/12.(lygsl, )
October 15, 2012 16 Featured Case Minute ORDER denying 15 motion presenting an opening argument, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/15/12.(lygsl, )
May 16, 2013 45 Featured Case MINUITE ORDER denying 44 Letter by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/16/13.(dkals, )
August 10, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Prisoner Complaint and the action are dismissed as legally frivolous. FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/10/12. (lygsl, )
April 2, 2014 57 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 56 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/2/14.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tillotson v. Hawkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hawkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Tillotson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]