Telluride Lodge Association, Inc. v. Norm McLean et al

Plaintiff: Telluride Lodge Association, Inc.
Defendant: Norm McLean, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Janice Stout and Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02054
Filed: August 6, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: San Miguel
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER. The 15 Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Department of the Treasury is approved. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/22/12. (mnfsl, )
December 17, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion to Remand Case Back to State Court. This case shall be remanded to the District Court for San Miguel County, Colorado, where it was filed as Case No. 2012CV70. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/17/12.(mnfsl, )
August 7, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/5/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/7/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Telluride Lodge Association, Inc. v. Norm McLean et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telluride Lodge Association, Inc.
Represented By: Diane Susan Wolfson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norm McLean
Represented By: Scott Timothy Erickson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Stout
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]