Laratta v. Burbank et al

Defendant: Lynn Travis, Raeanne Will, Malissa Jones, Dennis Burbank, Sean Foster, Dale Burke, Hartung and Tino Herrera
Plaintiff: Giovanni Laratta
Case Number: 1:2012cv02079
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintioff to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/27/12. (nmmsl, )
December 5, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER adopting 112 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and granting 103 Motion to Dismiss by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/5/14. (dkals, )
November 30, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Discharge 15 Order to Show Cause, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/30/12. (nmmsl, )
December 4, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the claims asserted against Defendant Tom Clements are dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Tom Clements is dismissed as a party to this action. FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/4/12. (sgrim)
February 19, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/19/2013. (kmtcd)
March 6, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/6/2013. (kmtcd)
April 22, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL: by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/22/13. (msksec, )
July 31, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 24 ) is DENIED as moot, as it is directed at a non-operative complaint. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/31/2013.(klyon, )
August 19, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Partially Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order (Doc. 33 ). Discovery due by 12/2/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2014. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/19/2013.(klyon, )
August 21, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/21/12, GRANTING 6 Motion To Show Cause, and ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Without Payment of An Initial Partial Filing Fee. (nmmsl, )
August 22, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12-2079. (nmmsl, )
March 26, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that (1) For the foregoing reasons, Mr. Laratta's Objections (#79) to the Recommendation are overruled. (2) The Court theref or GRANTS IN PART the Motion to Dismiss 62 filed by Mr. Raemisch, Mr. Kirby, and Mr. Foster. (3) The Court GRANTS the Partial Motion to Dismiss 48 filed by Mr. Burke, Mr. Travis, Ms. Will, and Mr. Herrera. (4) All claims against Mr. Burke, Ms. Will, Mr. Raemisch, and Mr. Kirby are dismissed. (5) Mr. Laratta's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint 80 is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as Mr. Laratta may file a Fourth Amended Complaint as to the retaliatory motive of Mr. Foster, and DENIED IN PART, insofar as the remainder of the requested amendment would be futile. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/26/14.(msksec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laratta v. Burbank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Travis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raeanne Will
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malissa Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Burbank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartung
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tino Herrera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Laratta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]