O'Leary, et al, v. County of El Paso, Colorado, et al.,

Defendant: Rachelle (I) Clemons, Paula Presley, Natasha (I) Wolinski, Sean (I) Ehlinger, Sean Ehlinger, Rachelle Clemons, Patricia Miller, L.P.N., Diane (I) Al-Abduljalil, Terry Maketa, Natasha Wolinski, County of El Paso, Colorado, El Paso County Sheriff's Office, Correctional Healthcare Management, Diane Al-Abduljalil and Patricia Miller
Plaintiff: Brandon O'Leary and Shane O'Leary
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02139
Filed: August 14, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving re: 23 Notice: Defendant Carol Ansley is dismissed from this action, without prejudice, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/18/2012. (rpmcd)
October 19, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 25 Notice of Scriverner's Error to Correct Name of Defendant: caption is amended to correct the name of Defendant Diane Miller, L.P.N., to Patricia Miller, L.P.N., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/19/2012.(rpmcd)
March 20, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 3/20/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Motions to Dismiss are granted with respect to the First, Second and Third Claims for Relief and remainder of the claims are dismissed for lack of jurisdiction re 34 , 35 , and 36 . Joint Motion on Behalf of All Defendants for Additional Extension of Time to Designate Nonparties at Fault 47 , is moot. This civil action is dismissed. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
March 20, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: the first, second and third claims for relief are dismissed under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and the fourth through eleventh claims for relief are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/20/2013. (rpmcd )
March 20, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re 52 : the first, second and third claims for relief are dismissed under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and the fourth through eleventh claims for relief are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1), by Deputy Clerk on 3/20/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: O'Leary, et al, v. County of El Paso, Colorado, et al.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachelle (I) Clemons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Presley
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Represented By: Charles Clark Greenlee
Represented By: Amy R. Folsom
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha (I) Wolinski
Represented By: Terry Cipoletti
Represented By: Chad Knox Gillam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean (I) Ehlinger
Represented By: Terry Cipoletti
Represented By: Chad Knox Gillam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Ehlinger
Represented By: Terry Cipoletti
Represented By: Chad Knox Gillam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachelle Clemons
Represented By: Kimberly F. W. DeLine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Miller, L.P.N.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane (I) Al-Abduljalil
Represented By: Terry Cipoletti
Represented By: Chad Knox Gillam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Maketa
Represented By: Amy R. Folsom
Represented By: Charles Clark Greenlee
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Wolinski
Represented By: Terry Cipoletti
Represented By: Chad Knox Gillam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of El Paso, Colorado
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Represented By: Charles Clark Greenlee
Represented By: Amy R. Folsom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Represented By: Charles Clark Greenlee
Represented By: Amy R. Folsom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Healthcare Management
Represented By: Chad Knox Gillam
Represented By: Terry Cipoletti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Al-Abduljalil
Represented By: Terry Cipoletti
Represented By: Chad Knox Gillam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Miller
Represented By: Kimberly F. W. DeLine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon O'Leary
Represented By: Phil (Phillip) L. Harding
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Kelley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane O'Leary
Represented By: Amy R. Folsom
Represented By: Phil (Phillip) L. Harding
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Kelley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]