Ryals v. City of Englewood

Plaintiff: Stephen Brett Ryals
Defendant: City of Englewood
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02178
Filed: August 17, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a four-day bench trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on July 22, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for June 26, 2013 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/17/2012. (rbjsec. )
July 22, 2013 50 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for Bench Trial - Day One held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/22/2013. Denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Opening statements. Evidence entered. Trial continued. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
July 24, 2013 53 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for Bench Trial - Day Three held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/24/2013. Denied as moot 36 Motion to Exclude. Evidence entered. Trial continued. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
July 25, 2013 55 Featured Case Stipulation and Order Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/25/13. (lag)
August 21, 2013 56 Featured Case FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER OF JUDGMENT. For the foregoing reasons, the Court directs that final judgment be entered in favor of the plaintiff, Stephen Ryals, and against the defendant, the City of Englewood. As the prevailing party, the plaintiff is awarded his reasonable costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/21/13. (alvsl)
August 22, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/22/2012. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ryals v. City of Englewood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Brett Ryals
Represented By: Sara J. Rich
Represented By: Thomas Austin Olsen
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Sullivan
Represented By: Daniel David Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Englewood
Represented By: Monica N. Kovaci
Represented By: Thomas Sullivan Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]