Barron v. Bent County Correctional Facility et al

Plaintiff: Jacinto Barron
Defendant: Bent County Correctional Facility, Brigham Sloan, Jan Bryant, Angie Turner, Ms. Scobee, Corrections Corporation of America (CCA) and Medical Staff Bent County Correctional Facility
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02278
Filed: August 27, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Bent
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER that Mr. Barron shall file a Second Amended Prisoner Complaint on or before Monday, November 19, 2012. Chambers staff has enclosed with this Order a copy of the Prisoner Complaint form for Mr. Barron's use. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/31/2012. (cbslc1)
February 15, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER for Service of 24 Second Amended Complaint filed by Jacinto Barron. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/15/13. (dkals, )
September 27, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 41 RECOMMENDATION. Defendant's 29 Motion to Dismiss is granted. This matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/27/13.(mnfsl, )
September 27, 2013 43 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 42 Order. By Clerk on 9/27/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barron v. Bent County Correctional Facility et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinto Barron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bent County Correctional Facility
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigham Sloan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Murphy
Represented By: Edmund Martin Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Michael Murphy
Represented By: Edmund Martin Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Turner
Represented By: Edmund Martin Kennedy
Represented By: Timothy Michael Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Scobee
Represented By: Edmund Martin Kennedy
Represented By: Timothy Michael Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America (CCA)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff Bent County Correctional Facility
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]