Garcia v. Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Lilia E. Garcia
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02482
Filed: September 18, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. ORDERED that the Motion to Consolidate by Defendant filed in Civil Action No. 12-cv-01824-WYD-KLM (ECF No. 19) is GRANTED. Lilia E. Garcia v. Internal Revenue Service, Civil Action No. 12-cv-02482-WY D-KMT, is consolidated with 12-cv-01842-WYD-KLM for all further purposes. ORDERED that as of the date of this Order, all pleadings and other filings shall be filed in Civil Action No. 12-cv-01824, using the caption appearing in this Order. ORDERED that Civil Action No. 12-cv-02482 shall hereafter be referred to the magistrate judge assigned to the lowest case, in this case Magistrate Judge Mix by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/11/12. (jjhsl, )
March 24, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; In light of the Court's Recommendation 124 that this consolidated action be dismissed, Plaintiff's Motions 9 14 18 19 and 24 are DENIED AS MOOT, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/24/2013.(klmcd, )
January 9, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's filings since the dismissal of this case (ECF Nos. 30-38) are improper and will not be considered by the Court. ORDERED that any further filings of this nature will be stricken by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/09/14. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Garcia v. Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilia E. Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]