McDonald v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al

Plaintiff: R. Kirk McDonald
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Citibank N.A., Chase Funding Mortgage Loan and Aset Backed Certificates 2002-4
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02749
Filed: October 16, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601 Real Estate Settlement Procedure Act of 1974 (RESPA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER At the request of the parties, the Court will hold a Status Conference in this case on July 31,2013, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United StatesCourthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado . The Plaintiff and counsel for Defendantsmay appear at the conference by telephone by first teleconferencing together, then calling myChambers at (303) 844-4507 at the appointed time. Status Conference set for 7/31/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/30/2013. Text Only Entry (mehlc2, )
August 7, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 105 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/7/2013.(klyon, )
September 10, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 111 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion & Request for Temporany [sic] Restraining Order Pursuant to United States District of Colorado Rule 65, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/10/2013. (mehcd)
January 30, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, MOTION TO DISMISS: The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 53 is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as the Court DISMISSES all of Mr. McDonald's claims in the Amended Complaint, with the exception of hi s tenth (RESPA), eleventh (RESPA), and thirteenth (C.R.S. § 38-40-103) claims for relief, for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction under Rooker-Feldman, and DENIED IN PART, insofar as the remaining three claims shall proceed to discovery. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/29/14.(msksec, )
February 11, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Court's Interlocutory [sic] Pursuant to Colorado Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 54(b), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/11/2014. (mehcd)
March 3, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motions Hearing held on 3/3/2014, denying without prejudice 131 Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Court's Interlocutory Pursuant to Col orado Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 54(B); denying without prejudice 133 Plaintiff's Motion: Joinder of Parties Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rules 20 & 42; granting 135 Non-Party's Motion to Quash Subpeonas (sic) or Alternatively Motion for Protective Order; granting 136 Non-Party's Motion to Quash Subpeona (sic) to Testify and Subpeona (sic) to Produce Documetns (sic) or in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying without prejudice in part [ 137] The Bank Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Issuance of Protective Order; denying without prejudice 139 Plaintiff's Motion & Request for Temporany (sic) Restraining Order Pursuant to United States District of Colorado Rul e 65(b); denying without prejudice 143 Plaintiff's Combined Motions Dated February 25, 2014, Amend Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a)(2) Addendum to Amended Complaint. Status Conference set for 3/17/2014 3:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
March 17, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Hearing and Status Conference held on 3/17/2014, denying without prejudice 153 Plaintiff's Mortion [sic] for Leave to File Amended Compl aint. The parties shall produce discovery documents as set forth on the record on or before 3/31/2014. The dispositive motion deadline is moved up to 5/1/2014. Status Conference set for 4/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. The Court will submit a separate recommendation that 151 Plaintiff's Motion & Request for TRO Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 65(b) be denied. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
April 11, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 163 Plaintiff's Request for Immediate Order [on] Motion for Certification Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 54(b), denying 164 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Granting Permission to Take Oral Testimony [Objection to Close of Discovery], and denying 167 Plaintiff's Motion for Judicial Notice. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/11/2014. (cpear)
May 1, 2014 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 179 Plaintiff's Motion for Status Conference, and granting 180 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Court's April 30, 2014 Minute Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part 176 Defendants Unopposed Mot ion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Status Conference set for 5/6/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion by 5/8/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/1/2014. (cpear)
February 15, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/15/13. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
May 7, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance and Service of Subpoenas In Forma Pauperis, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/2013. (mehcd)
October 17, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/17/12. (nmmsl, )
May 14, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Plaintiff's First Motion to Compel Defendant to Disclose Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37. Status Conference set for 5/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/14/2013. (mehcd)
May 16, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for Issuance and Service of Subpoenas in Forma Pauperis: With Request for Reconsideration. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/16/2013.(klyon, )
May 29, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 75 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 37 Motion for an order Compelling Oral Testimony, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/29/2013. (mehcd)
June 6, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 the Bank Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) and D.C. Colo. LCivR 30.2(A), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/6/2013. (mehcd)
July 2, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 90 Motion to Amend. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/2/2013.(klyon, )
July 2, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 92 Petition & Motion for Private Attorney General. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/2/2013.(klyon, )
October 17, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying 4 Motion for TRO. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/17/12.(msklc2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McDonald v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Kirk McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Funding Mortgage Loan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aset Backed Certificates 2002-4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]