Picco et al v. Glenn et al

Plaintiff: Glenn Picco and Francine Picco
Defendant: Kelly R. Glenn, Valley View Hospital Association, Bruce D. Lippman, II and Glenwood Medical Associates
Case Number: 1:2012cv02858
Filed: October 30, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the SupplementalDepositions of Brandi Cook, M.A. and Karen Gentry, R.N. and for Appropriate Sanctions Against Defendant Glenwood Medical Associates. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/9/2014.(klyon, )
August 20, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents pursuant to 96 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2014.(trlee, )
December 23, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 145 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is GRANTED. Steven P. Johnston shall be permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O. The Clerk is directed to remove Steven P. Johnston from electronic notification in this matter, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/23/14.(morti, )
January 29, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting case for trial. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/8/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. An eight day Jury Trial is set to commence on 11/2/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore, in Courtroom A 601. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/29/2015. (tscha, )
February 2, 2015 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 140 Motion to Compel / Motion for Reconsideration of 117 , by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/2/2015.(tscha, )
February 2, 2015 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 164 Motion for Leave to reset status conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/2/2015.(tscha, )
February 2, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 165 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendants Bruce D. Lippman, II, M.D. and Glenwood Medical Associates. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/2/2015.(tscha, )
April 1, 2015 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 196 Defendant Valley View Hospital Association's Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs from Calling Sylver Brown, R.N., as a Witness at the April 2, 2015 Hearing ; denying 202 Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O.'s Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs from Calling Kelly R. Glenn, D.O. as a Witness at the April 2, 2015 Hearing, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/2015.(emill)
May 5, 2015 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 174 Defendant Valley View Hospital Association's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/5/2015. (emill)
June 10, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order to Extend the Expert Witness Deadline. Scheduling Order 27 is amended, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/10/2013.(mjwcd)
July 23, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Second Stipulated Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order to Extend the Expert Witness Deadlines. The Scheduling Order (Docket No. 27 ) is amended to extend Plaintiff's expert disclosure deadline up to and includi ng September 30, 2013, Defendant's expert disclosure deadline up to and including November 11, 2013, and the parties' rebuttal designations deadline up to and including December 11, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/23/13. (alvsl)
September 3, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Granting 51 Valley View Hospital Association's Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order RE: Personnel File. Withdrawing 46 Defendant Valley View Hospital Association's Motion for Protective Order RE: Personnel File. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/3/2013.(mjwcd)
October 21, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Supplemental Deposition of Defendant, Bruce D. Lippman, M.D. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/21/2013.(mjwcd)
November 6, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Glenn Picco. Granting 60 Bruce D. Lippman, II, M.D. and Glennwood Medical Associates' Joinder in Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O.'s Mot ion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Glenn Picco. Granting 62 Valley View Hospital Association's Joinder in Defendant Kelly R. Glenn, D.O.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Glenn Picco. Motions granted as outlined in the Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/6/2013.(mjwcd)
December 17, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Brandi Cook, M.A.'s Personnel File from Defendant, Glenwood Medical Associates, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/17/2013.(mjwcd)
November 1, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/1/2012. (mjwcd)
February 21, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 80 Unopposed Motion to Temporarily Suspend Discovery and Authorizing Appointment of an Outside Mediator. Scheduling Order 27 is amended. Discovery due by 6/5/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/21/2014.(mjwcd)
May 27, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting case for trial: Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/25/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A fifteen day Jury Trial is to commence on 8/3/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore in Courtroom A 601. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/27/2014. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picco et al v. Glenn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Picco
Represented By: Alfred (Fred) F. Paoli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Picco
Represented By: Alfred (Fred) F. Paoli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly R. Glenn
Represented By: Steven Paul Johnston
Represented By: Peter Williams Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley View Hospital Association
Represented By: Douglas Edward Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Lippman, II
Represented By: Sheryl K. Bridges
Represented By: Barbara Hruby Glogiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenwood Medical Associates
Represented By: Sheryl K. Bridges
Represented By: Barbara Hruby Glogiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.