Bender v. CitiMortgage Inc., et al.,

Plaintiff: Deanne Bender
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Case Number: 1:2012cv02896
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/18/2012. (kmtcd)
April 3, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/3/13.(mjgsl, )
May 28, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Joint Motion To Administratively Close Case. This action may be reopened upon a showing of good cause by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/28/13.(jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. CitiMortgage Inc., et al.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanne Bender
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]