USA v. $9,000 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $9,000 in United States Currency
Claimant: Louis Figueroa
Case Number: 1:2012cv02909
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the United States' 15 Unopposed Motion to Lift Stay. The stay previously imposed in this matter is lifted, by Judge John L. Kane on 01/13/2015. (athom, )
March 19, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Forfeiture of Property, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/19/2015.(babia)
March 20, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge John L. Kane on 3/20/2015. (babia) Modified on 3/20/2015 to delete "by Clerk"(babia).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $9,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: James Sandy Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Louis Figueroa
Represented By: Ariel Zusya Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]