USA v. $4,700.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $4,700.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Claimant: Cesar Quinones Orozco
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02975
Filed: November 13, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/2/2013. (kmtcd)
April 22, 2013 23 Featured Case Final Order of Forfeiture. ORDER granting 22 Motion for Forfeiture of Property. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/22/13.(jjhsl, )
July 11, 2013 28 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that forfeiture of $2,750.00 of defendant $4,700.00 in United States currency shall enter in favor of the United States. The United States shall have full and legal title to the defendant property and may dispose of it in accordance with law and in accordance with the terms and provisions of the parties' Settlement Agreement. ORDERED that a Certificate of Reasonable Cause, which this Order constitutes, is GRANTED as to all defendant property pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465 by Clerk on 07/11/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. $4,700.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,700.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Wayne Campbell
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cesar Quinones Orozco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]