Watts v. Shulman et al

Defendant: Michael Astrue, Carolyn Simmons, J. Trujillo, Ellen Demitre, Annette Streeter and Douglas Shulman
Plaintiff: Howard M. Watts, Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02993
Filed: November 14, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying as moot 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying as moot 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying as moot 6 Motion for Order; denying as moot 9 Motion for Order; by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/22/2013.(skl)
January 23, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/23/2013. (skl)
April 1, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Commence Service of Process is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/1/2013.(klmcd, )
June 25, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 37 Motion to Set Aside. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a response to Defendants Colvin and Simmons' Motion to Dismiss (# 30 ) on or before July 12, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/25/13. (alvsl) (Main Document 41 replaced on 6/26/2013 in order to correct technical issues) (alvsl).
July 17, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Returning Order and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 34 ) With Instructions. Upon consideration of the foregoing, and being otherwise fully advised, it is hereby ORDERED that the Recommendation is returned to the Magistrate Judge with instructions to consider such additional information; conduct further proceedings, if appropriate; and issue a recommendation in light of the same. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/17/13. (alvsl)
November 19, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/19/12. (nmmsl, )
November 14, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 60 Motion for Change of Relief Request. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/14/2013.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Watts v. Shulman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Trujillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Demitre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Streeter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Shulman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard M. Watts, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]