Finn v. Suncor Energy et al

Defendant: Suncor Energy
Plaintiff: Derick Finn
Case Number: 1:2012cv03024
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 17 The Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order, and the proposed Stipulated Protective Order is refused, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/6/2013.(ervsl, )
May 13, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 20 the Amended Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/13/2013. (mehcd)
May 14, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/13/2013. (mehcd)
July 9, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 The Second Amended Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/9/2013.(ervsl, )
July 9, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/9/2013. (ervsl, )
July 10, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 The Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadline. Discovery due by 9/13/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2013. In light of this change, the Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for October 23,2013 is vacated and rescheduled. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 12/18/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/9/2013.(ervsl, )
January 15, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Proposed Pretrial Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/15/2014.(ervsl, )
July 3, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Summary judgment for Defendant Suncor is granted for the retaliation claim and denied for the discrimination claim. By Judge John L. Kane on 7/3/2014.(klyon, )
July 10, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Trial Preparation Conference proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 7/10/2014. Granting 62 Motion in Limine. ORDERED: Jury Trial is VACATED. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finn v. Suncor Energy et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Energy
Represented By: Darren E. Nadel
Represented By: Kalisha Salome Chorba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Finn
Represented By: Andrew T. Brake
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]