Rawlings et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Heather Rawlings and Michael Rawlings
Defendant: Bank of America N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Case Number: 1:2012cv03109
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/7/2013. (mjwcd)
January 7, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Joint Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings. Status Report due by 3/22/2013. This matter (including all deadlines) is STAYED until 3/29/2013. Scheduling Conference 2/26/2013 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/7/2013.(mjwcd)
March 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Second Joint Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings. This matter (including all deadlines) is STAYED until 6/27/2013. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint written status report on or before 4/25/2013, on or before 5/24/2013, and on or before 6/21/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/25/2013. (klyon, )
April 21, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendants Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., a foreign corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, a foreign entity, and John and Jane Does 1-10 Without Prejudice by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/21/14.(dkals, )
December 18, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Enlarge Deadlines. Scheduling Order 53 is amended, as set forth in the order. Discovery due by 4/6/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/18/2014.(emill)
November 28, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re; Rule 121 Duty to Confer by Mark D. Thompson, District Court Judge on 10/26/2012. (dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawlings et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Rawlings
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zachary Alden Christensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rawlings
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zachary Alden Christensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Claire Yvonne Sophie Dossier
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Claire Yvonne Sophie Dossier
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Claire Yvonne Sophie Dossier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]