Phillips v. Hsu

Plaintiff: Martha Phillips
Defendant: Richard Hung Hsu
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03111
Filed: November 28, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant's 16 Motion for Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/8/2013.(rpmcd)
October 4, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Motion to Consolidate 23 is denied and Motion to Stay Proceedings 26 is denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/4/2013.(rpmcd)
October 24, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 20 , granted in part as stated on record. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
November 26, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Strike the defense of failure to mitigate, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/26/2014.(rpmcd)
December 26, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 defendants Motion for Protective Order; granting 46 plaintiffs motion for extension of time to file dispositive motions on or before January 14, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/26/2013.(ervsl, )
June 18, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 76 : all claims between Plaintiff Martha Phillips and Defendant Richard Hung Hsu are dismissed with prejudice, each party shall bear his or her own costs and attorney fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014. (jsmit )
January 28, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/7/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on February 28, 2013, lead counsel present inperson and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/28/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Phillips v. Hsu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Phillips
Represented By: Carrie R. Frank
Represented By: Beth Ann Morrison Klein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hung Hsu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]